skip to content

Johnston, Sarah Jane

CPSO#: 86922

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jan 2023
EXPIRY DATE
27 Jan 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Johnston and Dr. Luyt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Luyt ( CPSO# 86596 )
Dr. S. Johnston ( CPSO# 86922 )

Business Address:
Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T8
Phone Number: (519) 426-0130

Business Address:
Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T8
Phone Number: (519) 426-0130

Business Address:
75 Parkview Road
Hagersville ON  N0A 1H0
Phone Number: (905) 768-3311

Business Address:
75 Parkview Road
Hagersville ON  N0A 1H0
Phone Number: (905) 768-3311

Business Address:
29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll ON  N5C 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 485-1700

Business Address:
29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll ON  N5C 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 485-1700

Business Address:
501 St. George Street
Port Dover ON  N0A 1N0
Phone Number: (519) 583-1422

Business Address:
501 St. George Street
Port Dover ON  N0A 1N0
Phone Number: (519) 583-1422

Business Address:
167 Ralph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9
Phone Number: (519) 842-3611

Business Address:
167 Ralph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9
Phone Number: (519) 842-3611

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:07 Jul 2010 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jan 2023