skip to content

Johnston, Ronald Elmer

CPSO#: 13664

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Dec 1951

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 11-Apr-2016

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Dr. Johnston's former secretary can be reached at 905-378-4647 ext. 49464 to access files 

Files for Dr. Johnston have been stored at:

Niagara Health System - St. Catherine’s Site
Out-Patient Mental Health
1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catherine’s, ON
L0S 0A9 
Date Received: 30 Jul 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:21 Nov 1956 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1951
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 2013