skip to content

Johnston, Kenneth Wayne

CPSO#: 21736

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Nov 1968
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Nov 1968

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Vascular Laboratory
6th Floor, Eaton Wing
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: 4163403552
Fax: (416) 340-5029 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: K. Wayne Johnston Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 15 2022

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:01 Jan 1971 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective:22 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KENNETH WAYNE JOHNSTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSTON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 1968