skip to content

Johnston, James Douglas

CPSO#: 87936

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Dec 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 19 Dec 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
KMH Cardiology and
Diagnostic Centres
Suite 108
751 B Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N4
Phone: (519) 569-7363 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

437 Norwich Avenue
Woodstock ON  N4S 3W4
Canada
Phone: 519-539-1261
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02

Southmount Health Care Centre
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Suite 3G
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 2W2
Canada
Phone: 1-877-564-5227
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Johnston Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 21 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Johnston ( CPSO# 87936 )

Business Address:
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Phone Number: (877) 564-5227

Business Address:
KMH Cardiology and Diagnostic Centres
Suite 207
751 B Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N4
Phone Number: (887) 564-5227

Business Address:
437 Norwich Avenue
Woodstock ON  N4S 3W4
Phone Number: (877) 564-5227

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective:19 Dec 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Dec 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 13 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Dec 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Dec 2012 Active
             Dr.  James  Douglas Johnston may practise medicine independently in cardiology,
            excluding interventional cardiology, only.