skip to content

Johnson, Wayne Douglas

CPSO#: 29174

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Wayne D. Johnson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 19 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Arkona Medical Centre, 14 Ubion Street, Arkona, ON, N0M 1B0
Date Received: 31 May 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016