skip to content

Johnson, Teela Nadine

CPSO#: 100305

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Suite 206
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: 416-586-5058
Fax: 416-586-4719 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Bridgepoint Active Healthcare
1 Bridgepoint Drive
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-8252
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. T.N. Johnson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 09 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Johnson ( CPSO# 100305)

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
206-600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5058

Business Address:
1 Bridgepoint Drive
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Phone Number: (416) 461-8252

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 10 Oct 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TEELA NADINE JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2016