skip to content

Johnson, Sonia Clare

CPSO#: 99571

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Oct 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 31 Oct 2012
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Oak Medical
2525 Old Bronte Road, Suite 200
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone: 905-582-7533 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

University of Toronto Erindale
University Health Service
3359 Mississauga Road North
Mississauga ON  L5L 1C6
Canada
Phone: 9058285255
Fax: 9058283852
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 31 Oct 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Oct 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 May 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 21 May 2014

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 15 May 2014 Active
                   Dr.  Sonia  Clare  Johnson  may practise medicine independently in Family
                  Medicine, only.