skip to content

Johnson, Samuel Ceaser

CPSO#: 94664

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Jun 2021
EXPIRY DATE
31 May 2022
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education as of 08 Jun 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Rajah Muthiah Medical College, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East General Hospital
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Department of Surgery
Queen's university
East York ON  M4C 3E7 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAMUEL CEASER JOHNSON shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. JOHNSON is enrolled at QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. JOHNSON shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. JOHNSON is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. JOHNSON shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. JOHNSON is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. JOHNSON no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 31 May 2022.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 25 Mar 2011
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 11 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jun 2021 to 31 Aug 2021
PEAP - CF - Neurosurgery

Queen's University, 01 Sep 2021 to 31 May 2022
CF - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2021