skip to content

Johnson, Richard Brent

CPSO#: 98313

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
201 Deacon Street 2nd Fl. Tower C
Pembroke ON  K8A 2J6
Phone: (613) 732-3422
Fax: 613-732-7115 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Richard Johnson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Johnson ( CPSO# 98313 )

Business Address:
201 Deacon Street
2nd Floor Tower C
Pembroke ON  K8A 2J6
Phone Number: (613) 732-3422

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RICHARD BRENT JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2014