skip to content

Johnson, Kirsten Noel

CPSO#: 85824

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Feb 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Feb 2022

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education: University of Calgary, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
600-2000 Av McGill College
Medalma Clinic
Montréal QC  H3A 3H3
Phone: 514-375-9928
Fax: 514-905-9832

Additional Practice Location(s)

390 Rue Notre-Dame O
Dialogue Health Technologies
Suite 200
Montréal QC  H2Y 1T9
Canada
Phone: 438-940-2635
County: 
Electoral District: 

Hwy 26
Dr. Y. K. Jeon Kittiwake Health Cen
New-Wes-Valley NL  A0G 1B0
Canada
Phone: 7095362406
County: 
Electoral District: 

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:17 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KIRSTEN NOEL JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2022