skip to content

Johnson, Davin Emanuel

CPSO#: 93208

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Department of Ophthalmology
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 2169 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

LASIK MD Ottawa
407 Laurier Avenue West
Ottawa ON  K1R 7Y7
Canada
Phone: (613) 288-2020
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Focus Eye Centre
1565 Carling Ave.
Ottawa ON  K1Z 8R1
Canada
Phone: 613-724-3937
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

LASIK MD Kingston
100 Princess St.
Kingston ON  K7L 1A7
Canada
Phone: 613-531-3337
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Focus Eye Centre
725 Arlington Park Pl
Kingston ON  K7M 7E4
Canada
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

1-725 Arlington Park Pl
KOVSC
Kingston ON  K7M 7E4
Canada
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Davin E Johnson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Johnson ( CPSO# 93208 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Department of Ophthalmology
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Business Address:
100 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1A7
Phone Number: (613) 531-3337

Business Address:
407 Laurier Avenue West
Ottawa ON  K1R 7Y7
Phone Number: (613) 288-2020

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVIN EMANUEL JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015