skip to content

Johnson, David

CPSO#: 25017

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Aug 1972
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 1972
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
221 Edgewood Drive
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6A2
Phone: (807) 630 1080
Fax: (807) 767 2206 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: David Johnson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 17 2007

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1972

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 19 Jun 1995
Summary:

In June 1995, Dr. Johnson pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 29(30) of Ontario Regulation 
548/90, as amended, in that he committed sexual impropriety with a patient.    The Discipline Committee accepted this plea 
and found Dr. Johnson guilty of professional misconduct.    Consequently, the Committee imposed the following penalty: 
 
   1. Dr. Johnson's licence to practice was to be suspended for a period of 120 days.    The final sixty days of this 
      suspension, however, were themselves to be suspended provided that he fulfilled the following conditions: 
 
      (a) Dr. Johnson was, at his own expense, to attend upon a psychiatrist acceptable to the Registrar and complete 
          such treatment in boundary and related issues as the psychiatrist considered necessary, to the satisfaction of 
          the Registrar.    In addition, Dr. Johnson, at his own expense, was to attend upon the psychiatrist not less than 
          22 months and not more than 24 months following the date of completion of the above-mentioned treatment 
          for a re-assessment of his psychiatric health as it related to this matter.    This re-assessment was to be to the 
          satisfaction of the Registrar.    Dr. Johnson was to consent to and direct the psychiatrist to report in writing to 
          the Registrar concerning the results of both the initial treatment and the re-assessment, which reports were to 
          be satisfactory to the Registrar. 
 
      (b) Dr. Johnson through his counsel was to express remorse for his actions and apologize to the complainant. 
 
      (c) Dr. Johnson was to have a third party present during the examination of all female patients, unless the patient 
          objected. 
 
      (d) Dr. Johnson was to have no contact with the complainant, except during the conduct of professional duties. 
 
      (e) Dr. Johnson was to post an irrevocable letter of credit in favour of the College in the amount of $10,000.00 for 
          a five-year period in respect of the complainant's therapy costs. 
 
   2. Dr. Johnson was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.    The Committee 
      also recommended that the Doctor's name be published. 


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 19, 1995