skip to content

Johns, David Robert

CPSO#: 20445

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2003
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2003

Summary

Date of Death: 28-May-2018

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 15 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2003