skip to content

Kao, John Te Shao

CPSO#: 65275

MEMBER STATUS
Suspended as of 26 Sep 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 19 Sep 2023

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: JTS Kao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kao ( CPSO# 65275 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Oak Valley Health - Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2023
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal Effective: 19 Sep 2023
Suspension of registration imposed: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal Effective: 26 Sep 2023

Previous Hearings

Committee: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Decision Date: 19 Sep 2023
Summary:

On September 19, 2023, the Tribunal found that Dr. Kao engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by providing medical care and treatment to Individual X, a family member/person close to him. 

 

The Tribunal ordered that: 

 

  • Dr. Kao attend before the panel to be reprimanded; 
  • the Registrar suspend Dr. Kao’s certificate of registration for five (5) months commencing September 26, 2023; 
  • the Registrar place terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Kao’s certificate of registration; 
  • Dr. Kao pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by October 19, 2023.
 

 

The panel’s reasons for decision will be released shortly. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected].  


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Merits, Penalty and Reprimand; 2023-09-19