skip to content

Taliano, John Patrick

CPSO#: 63148

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Sep 1990
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 29 Nov 2018
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 304
180 Vine Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 7P3
Phone: (905) 641-9582
Fax: (905) 641-9420 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 402
5400 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2G 5X7
Canada
Phone: (905) 356-6215
Fax: (905) 356-5298
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: John Taliano Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 08 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Taliano ( CPSO# 63148 )

Business Address:
304 - 180 Vine Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 641-1836

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1990
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 29 Nov 2018

Pending Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Summary:

Allegations of Dr. Taliano’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Taliano engaged in sexual abuse and/or in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct with respect to a patient, who was a minor at the time, including by engaging in touching of an inappropriate and/or sexual nature. It is also alleged that Dr. Taliano engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct with respect to Mr. B, who was a minor at the time, including by engaging in touching and comments of an inappropriate and/or sexual nature


Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): October 28 - November 1 and November 18-19, 20 (half day afternoon), 22, 2019 motion date August 23, 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 29 Nov 2018 Active
             As from November 29, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. John Patrick Taliano,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Taliano to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. JOHN PATRICK TALIANO
                                          ("Dr. Taliano")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended;

                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the
                  College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Taliano, certificate of registration number 63148, am a member of
                  the College.

            (3)   I, Dr. Taliano, acknowledge that the College has referred to the
                  Discipline Committee, allegations that I engaged in sexual abuse and/or
                  in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct with respect to a
                  patient, who was a minor at the time, including by engaging in touching
                  of an inappropriate and/or sexual nature. It is also alleged that I
                  engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct with
                  respect to Mr. B, who was a minor at the time, including by engaging in
                  touching and comments of an inappropriate and/or sexual nature.

            (4)   I, Dr. Taliano, have read the Notice of Hearing dated November 7, 2018,
                  which sets out the allegations against me.  I am aware of the College's
                  concern about protecting the public and I understand the nature of the
                  allegations against me.

            (5)   I, Dr. Taliano, acknowledge that the College has accepted this
                  Undertaking in lieu of making an Order under section 25.4 of the Code at
                  this time.

            (6)   I, Dr. Taliano, acknowledge that this Undertaking continues in force
                  until the matters currently referred are disposed of by a panel of the
                  Discipline Committee.

            B.    UNDERTAKING AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (7)   I, Dr. Taliano, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately ("Effective Date").

            (8)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Taliano, undertake that I shall not engage in any
                        professional encounters, in person or otherwise ("Professional
                        Encounter" or "Professional Encounters"), with any patient under
                        eighteen (18) years of age, in any jurisdiction, unless the
                        Professional Encounter takes place in the continuous presence and
                        under the continuous observation of a monitor who is a regulated
                        health professional acceptable to the College (the "Practice
                        Monitor"), and unless the other requirements provided in this
                        Undertaking are fulfilled. For further clarity, I understand that I
                        must not be alone with any patient under eighteen (18) years of
                        age, for any length of time, during any Professional Encounter,
                        whether or not the parent or guardian of the patient is also
                        present.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Taliano, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Practice
                        Monitor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A" and
                        understand what is required of the Practice Monitor including, but
                        not limited to:
                  
                        1.    providing reports (as described in the Practice Monitor's
                              undertaking) to the College on at least a monthly basis; 
                  
                        2.    remaining present at all times during all Professional
                              Encounters with any patient under eighteen (18) years of age; 
                  
                        3.    carefully observing all of my Professional Encounters with
                              any patient under eighteen (18) years of age, including but
                              not limited to physical examinations.  I further acknowledge
                              my obligation to ensure the Practice Monitor's view of all of
                              my Professional Encounters with any patient under eighteen
                              (18) years of age, including physical examinations, is
                              unobstructed at all times; 
                        4.    refraining from performing any other functions, except those
                              required in the Practice Monitor's undertaking attached as
                              Appendix "A",  while observing me in all my Professional
                              Encounters with any patient under eighteen (18) years of age;

                        5.    maintaining a log of all Professional Encounters with any
                              patient under eighteen (18) years of age in the form attached
                              to this Undertaking as Appendix "B" (the "Log");
                  
                        6.    initialing all corresponding entries in the records of
                              patients noted in the Log; and
                  
                        7.    submitting the original Log to the College on a monthly
                              basis.'
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Taliano, undertake to maintain an up to date copy of the Log
                        by ensuring a copy is made at the end of each business day, and to
                        make it available to the College upon request. 
                  
            (9)   I, Dr. Taliano, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                  location that I practise or have privileges including, but not limited to
                  any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities
                  with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my
                  "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of
                  executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform
                  the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of
                  commencing practice at that location.

            (10)  Posting a Sign

                  (a)   I, Dr. Taliano, undertake that, effective immediately, I shall post
                        a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting
                        rooms, in all of my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and
                        secure location, in the form set out in Appendix "C" that states:
                        "Dr. Taliano has agreed not to have professional encounters, in
                        person or otherwise, with any patient under eighteen (18) years of
                        age, unless in the continuous presence and under the continuous
                        observation of a practice monitor acceptable to the College of
                        Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario.  Dr. Taliano has agreed not to
                        be alone during any professional encounter with any patient under
                        eighteen (18) years of age. Further information may be found on the
                        College website at www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Taliano, undertake to post a certified translation in any
                        language in which I provide services, of the sign described in
                        section (10)(a), in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and
                        consulting rooms, in all of my Practice Locations, in a clearly
                        visible and secure location, in the form set out at Appendix "C."
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Taliano, undertake to provide the certified translation
                        described in section (10)(b), to the College within thirty (30)
                        days of executing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Taliano, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of
                        this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language, I will
                        notify the College prior to providing any such services.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Taliano, undertake to provide to the College the certified
                        translation described in section (11)(b) prior to providing
                        services in any language described in section (10)(d).
                  
            (11)  I, Dr. Taliano, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (12)  I, Dr. Taliano, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any chief of staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs
                  of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Taliano, acknowledge that a breach of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and may
                  result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline
                  Committee.

            (14)  I, Dr. Taliano, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking, and that I have obtained independent
                  legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
                  my right to do so.

            (15)  I, Dr. Taliano, acknowledge that, in the event of an appeal of any Order
                  of the Discipline Committee, if the Discipline Committee has directed the
                  Registrar to revoke, suspend, or impose terms and conditions on my
                  certificate of registration, that Order will take effect immediately
                  despite any appeal.

            (16)  I, Dr. Taliano, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Taliano, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code.

            (18)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Taliano, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Taliano, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (20)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Taliano is the subject of a referral to the Discipline
                              Committee into allegations of sexual abuse and/or in
                              disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct with
                              respect to a patient, who was a minor at the time. As a
                              result of the referral:
                  
                                    Dr. Taliano has agreed not to engage in any
                                    professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with
                                    any patient under eighteen (18) years of age, in any
                                    jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter takes place
                                    in the continuous presence of a monitor who is a
                                    regulated health professional acceptable to the
                                    College, and unless the other requirements provided in
                                    Dr. Taliano's Undertaking with the College are
                                    fulfilled.  For further clarity, Dr. Taliano has agreed
                                    not to be  alone with any patient under eighteen (18)
                                    years of age during any professional encounter.
                  
                                    Dr. Taliano has agreed to post a sign in all waiting
                                    rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all
                                    Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure
                                    location, that states: "Dr. Taliano has agreed not to
                                    have professional encounters, in person or otherwise,
                                    with any patient under eighteen (18) years of age,
                                    unless in the continuous presence of a practice monitor
                                    acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of
                                    Ontario.  Dr. Taliano has agreed not to be alone with
                                    any patient under eighteen (18) years of age during any
                                    professional encounter. Further information may be
                                    found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
            C.    CONSENT

            (19)  I, Dr. Taliano, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (20)  I, Dr. Taliano, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "D".

            (21)  I, Dr. Taliano, consent to submit and not interfere with, unannounced
                  inspections of my Practice Locations and patient records by the College
                  and to any other activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor
                  my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (22)  I, Dr. Taliano, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to all Practice Monitors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (23)  I, Dr. Taliano, give my irrevocable consent to all Practice Monitors to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the provisions of the Practice
                        Monitor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A";

                  (c)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking.
                  
            (24)  I, Dr. Taliano, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (25)  I, Dr. Taliano, give my irrevocable consent to all Chiefs of Staff to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information relevant to
                  this Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                  compliance with this Undertaking.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: November 29, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. John Patrick Taliano to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 29, 2018:

Dr. Taliano is the subject of a referral to the Discipline Committee into allegations of sexual abuse and/or in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct with respect to a patient, who was a minor at the time. As a result of the referral:

Dr. Taliano has agreed not to engage in any professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with any patient under eighteen (18) years of age, in any jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter takes place in the continuous presence of a monitor who is a regulated health professional acceptable to the College, and unless the other requirements provided in Dr. Taliano’s Undertaking with the College are fulfilled. For further clarity, Dr. Taliano has agreed not to be alone with any patient under eighteen (18) years of age during any professional encounter.

Dr. Taliano has agreed to post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, that states: “Dr. Taliano has agreed not to have professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with any patient under eighteen (18) years of age, unless in the continuous presence of a practice monitor acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. Dr. Taliano has agreed not to be alone with any patient under eighteen (18) years of age during any professional encounter. Further information may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca”.