skip to content

Kitakufe, John Justin Chrozy

CPSO#: 26157

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 03 Sep 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 12 Feb 2001

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ganda, Soga, Swahili

Education:University of Ottawa, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Sharon Kour email: [email protected]
Date Received: 07 Apr 2010


Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Ms. Stella Sight Unit 516 1280 Finch Avenue West Toronto, Ontario M3J 3K6
Date Received: 09 Jan 2008

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Feb 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2001
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2001
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 18 May 2007
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 01 May 2008
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 03 Sep 2010

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Feb 2010
Summary:

On February 8, 2010, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Kitakufe’s admission and 
 found that Dr. Kitakufe engaged in acts of professional misconduct in that he has been 
found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise; and that he has 
committed an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to 
all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
dishonourable or unprofessional. 

On August 29, 2007, Dr. Kitakufe pleaded guilty to, and was convicted of the criminal 
charges of:  unlawfully conspired to commit Fraud exceeding $5000, by participation in a 
scheme to defraud the Ministry of Health and Long Term Care through the use of 
fraudulent prescriptions for oxycodone; unlawfully conspired to commit the indictable 
offence of Trafficking in a controlled substance, oxycodone; and, unlawfully by deceit, 
falsehood or other fraudulent means, defrauded the Ministry of Health and Long Term 
Care of money of a value exceeding $5000 by submitting fraudulent claims for medical 
services, for which the Ministry remitted payment. Dr. Kitakufe was sentenced to 32 
months in custody and ordered to pay restitution in the amount of $50,000. 

 After hearing submissions and evidence on penalty, the Committee reserved its decision 
on penalty on March 3, 2010.  On September 3, 2010, the Committee ordered and 
directed that:  

   1. Dr. Kitakufe appear before the Discipline Committee to be reprimanded. 

   2. The Registrar revoke Dr. Kitakufe’s certificate of registration effective 
      immediately. 

The Committee also ordered that Dr. Kitakufe shall pay to the College its costs fixed at 
$18,250.00 within six (6) months of the date of this order. 
 
On September 22, 2016 Dr. Kitakufe applied for reinstatement of his certificate of 
practice. The application was heard August 23-26, 2021. The panel dismissed the 
Applications finding Dr. Kitakufe had not demonstrated the suitability of his 
reinstatement at this time.  
 
The panel noted in particular, the seriousness of the prior misconduct, insufficient 
rehabilitation and incomplete insight into his misconduct, and that the risk of his 
reoffending is not acceptably low or manageable. Further, the panel found there was a 
lack of meaningful evidence about Dr. Kitakufe’s current clinical competence and he 
failed to propose a plan for a safe return to practice. Finally, the panel concluded that 
reinstatement of Dr. Kitakufe’s certificate of registration would diminish public 
confidence in the profession and its ability to regulate itself in the public interest.  
 
Reasons for decision are reported at Kitakufe v. College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
Ontario, 2021 ONPSDT 41.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): February 8-12, March 3, 2010

Application for Reinstatement  
Decision Date: 18 Oct 2021
Decision: Application Denied

 

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Feb 2001
Summary:

 On February 12, 2001, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Kitakufe(s guilty plea and found him 
 guilty of professional misconduct in that he has been found guilty of an offence relevant to his 
 suitability to practise by another jurisdiction (United States District Court, Northern District 
 of Illinois.)

In accordance with the Consent Disposition, the Discipline Committee Ordered:

1) 
 	that Dr. Kitakufe(s certificate of registration be suspended for six-months; the six-	months 
 having been served from October 1, 1999, to April 1, 2000;
2) 	the Registrar is directed to impose 
 terms, conditions, and limitations on Dr. Kitakufe(s                   certificate of registration 
 that he may continue to practise only if and as long as he:

(A) permits the College to monitor 
 his accounts to the Ontario Health Insurance Plan  	       approximately annually;
(B) authorizes 
 the College to obtain information from the Ontario Health Insurance Plan 	      about his billings 
 to the Plan; 
(C) pays the expenses of the monitoring in an amount not to exceed $3,500 per year 	 
      within  60 days of being billed for the expenses for a period of five years from the          
                  date of the Order.
3) 	recorded reprimand;
4) 	costs, in the amount of $3,750 to 
 be paid to the College by March 30, 2001.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Feb 12, 2001