skip to content

Shin, John Junwon

CPSO#: 122225

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2020
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Ottawa, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Parkdale Medical Centre
204 - 132 Parkdale Ave S
Hamilton ON  L8K 3P3 Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOHN JUNWON SHIN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SHIN is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. SHIN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SHIN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. SHIN shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SHIN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SHIN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2023.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2021 to 31 Jan 2022
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Feb 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2022 to 31 Jan 2023
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Feb 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2023