skip to content

Taliano, John Patrick

CPSO#: 63148

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 15 Apr 2021
EXPIRY DATE
15 Apr 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 29 Nov 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: John Taliano Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 15 2021
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

1 800 971 8038
Extension 702
Records Access Services Canada, Inc.
Date Received: 08 Dec 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1990
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 29 Nov 2018
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 15 Apr 2021

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 22 Oct 2020
Summary:

On October 22, 2020, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. John Taliano committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in sexual abuse of a patient; and engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all of the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  

Patient A

The Committee found that Dr. Taliano engaged in professional misconduct in that he sexually abused Patient A by inappropriately touching his testicles and penis under the guise of a medical examination, and that this also constitutes disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

The Committee also found that Dr. Taliano engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by telling Patient “A” to “Drop his pants”, and by insisting on examining Patient A despite his protestations and refusal of a genital examination.

Witness B

The Committee found that Dr. Taliano engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by entering the shower of Witness B while naked and touching Witness B’s penis, and by making a comment regarding Witness B's penis size in the presence of others.

On January 11, 2021, the Committee heard submissions from both parties on penalty and costs.

On April 15, 2021, the Discipline Committee released its penalty and costs decision, in which it directed and ordered:
  1. The Registrar shall revoke Dr. Taliano’s certificate of registration effective immediately;
  2. Dr. Taliano shall appear before the panel to be reprimanded within 30 days of the date this order becomes final;
  3. Dr. Taliano shall comply with the College’s Policy, “Closing a Medical Practice”;
  4. Dr. Taliano shall reimburse the College for funding provided to patients under the program required under s. 85.7 of the Code, and shall post an irrevocable letter of credit or other security acceptable to the College to guarantee payment of such amounts within 30 days of the date this order becomes final, in the amount of $17,370; and
  5. Dr. Taliano shall pay costs of $124,440 to the College within 30 days.

Appeal

On May 17, 2021, Dr. Taliano appealed the Discipline Committee’s October 22, 2020 decision finding that Dr. Taliano committed an act of professional misconduct and the Committee’s April 15, 2021 penalty decision to the Divisional Court.

Pursuant to section 71 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, an order made by a panel of the Discipline Committee directing the Registrar to revoke a member’s certificate of registration takes effect immediately, despite any appeal, where the Committee found that the member committed sexual abuse.

On June 20, 2022, the Divisional Court released its decision dismissing Dr. Taliano’s appeal from the decisions of the Discipline Committee.

On July 5, 2022, Dr. Taliano filed a Notice of Motion with the Court of Appeal for Ontario for leave to appeal the Divisional Court’s decision of June 20, 2022.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Merits: 2019-10-28, 30 to 31; 2019-11-01, 18 to 20, 22; 2019-12-10; Penalty: 2021-01-11

Concerns

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: December 10, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Please note that this matter has been appealed to HPARB.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)