skip to content

Joffe, Robert

CPSO#: 86782

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Feb 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Emergency Department
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Blvd
Toronto ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: 416-494-2120 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Peel Memorial Urgent Care
20 Lynch St
Brampton
Toronto ON  L6W 2Z8
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Robert Joffe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Joffe ( CPSO# 86782 )

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 949-2120

Business Address:
Peel Memorial Urgent Care
20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8271

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Feb 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:12 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBERT JOFFE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOFFE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 28 Feb 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Mar 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2010