skip to content

Jocko, Jennifer Ann

CPSO#: 90593

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1596 Regent Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z6
Phone: (705) 222-0492
Fax: (705) 222-7226 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

161 Applegrove Street
Sudbury ON  P3C 1N2
Canada
Phone: (705) 675-1596
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

11 Meredith Street
Little Current ON  P0P 1K0
Canada
Phone: (705) 368-2300
County: Territorial District of Manitoulin
Electoral District: 08

41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
Phone: 7055237000
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

16A Complex Dr
Wikwemikong ON  P0P2J0
Canada
Phone: 7058593164
County: Territorial District of Manitoulin
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. Jocko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Jocko ( CPSO# 90593 )

Business Address:
1596 Regent Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z6
Phone Number: (705) 222-0492

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
161 Applegrove Street
Sudbury ON  P3C 1N2
Phone Number: (705) 675-1596

Business Address:
11 Meredith Street
Little Current ON  P0P 1K0
Phone Number: (705) 368-2300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JENNIFER ANN JOCKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOCKO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014