skip to content

Joaquin, Andrew Josaphat

CPSO#: 27789

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jun 2001
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 21 Jun 2001

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of West Indies, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective:14 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jun 2001