skip to content

Jo, Susan

CPSO#: 93419

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial
Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: 905-845-2571 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hamilton Health Sciences-MUMC
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 44697
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hamilton Health Sciences-Juravinski
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 44697
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hamilton Health Sciences-General
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 44697
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Susan Jo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Jo ( CPSO# 93419 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences - General
Department of Anesthesia
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences - Juravinski
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SUSAN JO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015