skip to content

Jirsch, Jacqueline Edith

CPSO#: 26111

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Nov 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Nov 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:09 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Aug 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Nov 2010