skip to content

Jindal, Nina

CPSO#: 91907

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Aug 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Lakhani, Nina (used until: 03 Dec 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Kasturba Medical College, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: 416-864-3056
Fax: 416-864-6046 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

13291 Yonge St #401
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Canada
Phone: (905) 773-1599
Fax: 905-773-3515
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

G118 - 520 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON  M1R 0B1
Canada
Phone: (416) 673-9370
Fax: 416-673-9371
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Danforth Medical Centre
880 Danforth Road
Scarborough ON  M1K 1H8
Canada
Phone: (416) 264-4848
Fax: 4162640547
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

240 Duncan Mill Rd
Suite 703
Toronto ON  M4V 1R2
Canada
Phone: (416) 944-8333
Fax: (416) 944-1582
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Nina Jindal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Jindal ( CPSO# 91907 )

Business Address:
30 Bond Street
4CC Clinics
Toronto ON  M5B 1Q8
Phone Number: (416) 864-3056

Business Address:
13291 Yonge Street
Suite 401
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone Number: (905) 773-1599

Business Address:
3400 Danforth Avenue
Suite 6
Scarborough ON  M1L 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 693-3030

Business Address:
202 St. Clair Avenue West
Toronto ON  M4V 1R2
Phone Number: (416) 944-8333

Business Address:
880 Danforth Road
Scarborough ON  M1K 1H8
Phone Number: (416) 264-4848

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jul 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective:27 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NINA JINDAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JINDAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 04 Aug 2009 to 26 Oct 2009
AVP - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 27 Oct 2009 to 03 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 04 Aug 2010 to 03 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 04 Aug 2011 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 31 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University Of Toronto, 31 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2013