skip to content

Jindal, Kunaal

CPSO#: 88480

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Dec 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Dec 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
362 Fairlawn Ave
Toronto ON  M5M1T6
Phone: 416-256-5614 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

2920 Dufferin St
suite 202
North York ON  M6B 3S8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

195 Avenue Rd
Toronto ON  M5R 2J3
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1131A Leslie St
North York ON  M3C 3L8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kunaal Jindal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Jindal ( CPSO# 88480 )

Business Address:
605 McCowan Road
Scarborough ON  M1J 1J9
Phone Number: (416) 439-1718

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Business Address:
362 Fairlawn Avenue
Toronto ON  M5M 1T6
Phone Number: (416) 256-5614

Business Address:
195 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5R 2J3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KUNAAL JINDAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JINDAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2013