skip to content

Jina, Abdul Fazal

CPSO#: 30601

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Apr 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 22 Feb 1979

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:McMaster University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. A.F. Jina Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 8 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: 5-130 Ouelette Place Windsor ON N8X 1L9
Date Received: 30 Apr 2019

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.


Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  February 13, 2018
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On March 8, 2018, Windsor Regional Hospital notified the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, pursuant to s.85.5(2) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that effective February 13, 2018, Dr. Abdul Jina voluntarily ceased to exercise his privileges at Windsor Regional Hospital.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:15 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Apr 2019