skip to content

Jin, Jennifer

CPSO#: 94906

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jul 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:08 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:06 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 28 Mar 2011 to 17 Apr 2011
EL - Gastroenterology

Queen's University, 18 Apr 2011 to 06 May 2011
EL - Gastroenterology

University Of Toronto, 23 May 2011 to 17 Jun 2011
EL - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University Of Toronto, 01 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Gastroenterology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 08 Oct 2015
CF - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jul 2016