skip to content

Jimoh, Olubukola Yemisi

CPSO#: 88956

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Kwazulu-Natal, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4180 Dundas St W
Toronto ON  M8X 1X8
Phone: (416) 233-0725 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

4046 Erin Mills Pkwy,
Mississauga ON  L5L2W7
Canada
Phone: (905) 569-0004
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

30 The queensway
Etobicoke ON  M6R1B5
Canada
Phone: 4165306000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. O.Y. Jimoh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 15 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Jimoh ( CPSO# 88956 )

Business Address:
St Josephs Hospital
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M5R 2A7
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Business Address:
4180 Dundas Street West
Etobicoke ON  M8X 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 233-0725

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. OLUBUKOLA YEMISI JIMOH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIMOH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010