skip to content

Jiang, Yue

CPSO#: 97562

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Mar 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Neurology
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3111 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 01 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. YUE JIANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 14 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Queen's University, 15 Aug 2016 to 22 May 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Queen's University, 23 May 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 22 May 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 May 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2019