skip to content

Jia, Susan Zhaoyuan

CPSO#: 96923

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Mandarin

Education:McGill University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 317
2330 Kennedy Rd
Scarborough ON  M1T 0A2
Phone: 416-609-8868
Fax: 416-665-1670 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Susan Jia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 03 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Jia ( CPSO# 96923 )

Business Address:
317 - 2330 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1T 0A2
Phone Number: (416) 609-8868

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SUSAN ZHAOYUAN JIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 24 Oct 2011 to 20 Nov 2011
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013