skip to content

Jhas, Sumitpal Singh

CPSO#: 90710

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Neurological Associates
101 Queensway West, Suite 134
Toronto ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 279-3533
Fax: (905) 615-0492 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jhas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 10 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Jhas ( CPSO# 90710 )

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
Trillium Neurological Associates
134 - 101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 279-3533


Corporation Name: Shahideh Jhas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shahideh ( CPSO# 88517 )
Dr. S. Jhas ( CPSO# 90710 )

Business Address:
101 Queensway West
Suite 134
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 279-3533

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SUMITPAL SINGH JHAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JHAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015