skip to content

Jeyarajan, Gaiathry

CPSO#: 98909

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Psychiatry
North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 0A4
Phone: (705) 474-8600 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. G. Jeyarajan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Jeyarajan ( CPSO# 98909 )

Business Address:
North Bay Regional Health Centre
Department of Psychiatry
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GAIATHRY JEYARAJAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEYARAJAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017