skip to content

Jeyaraj, Hamilton

CPSO#: 86403

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Jan 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Jan 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Kasturba Medical College, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Trust Clinics
Oshawa Health Centre
247 Simcoe Street North 1st Floor
Oshawa ON  L1G 4T3
Phone: (905) 728-7915
Fax: (905) 443-0171 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Medical Trust Clinics
1471 Harmony Road
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K5
Canada
Phone: 905-440-7461
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

The Oshawa Pain Management Clinic
111 Simcoe Street North
Suite 100
Oshawa ON  L1G4S4
Canada
Phone: 289-316-1645
Fax: 289-316-1645
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Hamilton Jeyaraj Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Jeyaraj ( CPSO# 86403 )

Business Address:
Oshawa Health Centre
247 Simcoe Street North
1st Floor
Oshawa ON  L1G 4T3
Phone Number: (905) 728-7915


Corporation Name: Subhra Mohapatra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 4 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:09 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HAMILTON JEYARAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEYARAJ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2009