skip to content

Jewett, Michael Alexander Spencer

CPSO#: 22988

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Mar 1976
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Mar 1976

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Hospital
Room 3-130
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2909 Ext. 3
Fax: (416) 946-6590 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

11 Rose Avenue
Toronto ON  M4X 1N6
Canada
Phone: 416-505-9936 Ext. Mr
Fax: (416) 946-6590
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jewett Gallie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 26 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jewett ( CPSO# 22988 )
Dr. B. Gallie ( CPSO# 28022 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
3-130 - 610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2909

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:07 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL ALEXANDER SPENCER JEWETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEWETT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Mar 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 1976