skip to content

Jerath, Angela

CPSO#: 89387

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Sep 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Sep 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
1075 Bayview Ave
Toronto
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4864 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A. Jerath Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:09 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANGELA JERATH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JERATH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 15 Aug 2008
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 16 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Oct 2010
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2011