skip to content

Jenkin, Jeffrey Kerr

CPSO#: 31832

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospitals
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

Group Health Center
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Canada
Phone: (705) 759-1234
Fax: (705) 759-7469
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jeffrey K. Jenkin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Jenkin ( CPSO# 31832 )

Business Address:
Sault Ste. Marie Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Business Address:
Group Health Center
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-5551


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 24 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JEFFREY KERR JENKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JENKIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1980