skip to content

Jelaidan, Ibrahim Malek Y

CPSO#: 97372

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Mar 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Mar 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Taibah University College of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2 Gurdwara Rd
Room #602
Nepean ON  K2E 1A2
Phone: (613) 714-9855 Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:18 Oct 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. IBRAHIM MALEK Y JELAIDAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JELAIDAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Apr 2012 to 03 Jun 2012
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine

Western University, 04 Jun 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2017