skip to content

Jeffries, Gregory Allan

CPSO#: 87123

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Feb 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Feb 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
Department of Hospital Medicine
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Maplehurst Correctional Complex
661 Martin Street
Milton ON  L9T 2Y3
Canada
Phone: (905) 878-8141
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Greg Jeffries Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Jeffries ( CPSO# 87123 )

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
661 Martin Street
Milton ON  L9T 2Y3
Phone Number: (905) 878-8141

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Oakville Trafalgar,Memorial Hospit Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GREGORY ALLAN JEFFRIES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEFFRIES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2010