skip to content

Kolbasnik, Jeffrey Gennady

CPSO#: 68952

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 210
400 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 0H7
Phone: (905) 693-1338
Fax: (905) 693-1351 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jeff Kolbasnik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 10 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kolbasnik ( CPSO# 68952 )

Business Address:
Suite 210
400 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 0H7
Phone Number: (905) 693-1338

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital Milton

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  December 1, 2020
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On December 1, 2020, Halton Healthcare notified the College, pursuant to s.33(c ) of the Public Hospitals Act and s.85.5(2) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that Dr. Kolbasnik has, effective immediately, agreed to voluntarily cease exercising his privileges at Halton Healthcare, after being convicted on November 30, 2020, of the charge of sexual assault contrary to s.271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  February 21, 2019
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On February 7, 2019, Halton Healthcare notified the College, pursuant to S.33 (b) of the Public Hospitals Act and s.85.5 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that effective February 21, 2019 to May 21, 2019, the hospital privileges held by Dr. Jeffrey Gennady Kolbasnik at Halton Healthcare are suspended.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JEFFREY GENNADY KOLBASNIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOLBASNIK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000

Pending Hearings

Summary:

Allegations of Dr. Kolbasnik’s professional misconduct have been referred to what is now called the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal. It is alleged that in approximately 2017 and 2018, Dr. Kolbasnik engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and/or conduct unbecoming, including, but not limited to, behaving in an inappropriate and sexual manner towards an employee at a hospital where Dr. Kolbasnik holds privileges. It is also alleged that Dr. Kolbasnik has been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practice medicine in that on November 30, 2020 he has been found guilty of sexual assault contrary to the Criminal Code of Canada.


Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): December 20, 2021

Concerns

Source: Other
Active Date: February 24, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
FINDING OF GUILT

Jeffrey Kolbasnik was found guilty of the following offence:

(1) Sexual assault, contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.

DATE: November 30, 2020
SENTENCE: January 26, 2021 Suspended sentence; 12 months probation; DNA Order; Order to comply with SOIRA (Sex Offender Information Registration Act) for 10 years; Victim surcharge of $100.

Note: Dr. Kolbasnik has filed an appeal.