skip to content

Jeffery, Andrew Herbert

CPSO#: 87098

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 12 Sep 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Nov 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew Jeffery Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 13 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
AVP - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 15 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 12 Sep 2014
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Sep 2014