skip to content

Jefferies, John William Tasker

CPSO#: 23609

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 22 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 18 Jun 1971

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. John Jefferies Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 11 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: 197 Belmoral Drive, Orillia, ON L3V 5P9
Date Received: 19 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:10 Mar 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jun 2015