skip to content

Jayatilaka, Padmali Udayani

CPSO#: 95157

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Apr 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Apr 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhala

Education:University of Colombo, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
785 Wonderland Road South
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone: 5196416712
Fax: 5196416189 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

105-641 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6C 2T9
Canada
Phone: 5196868585
Fax: 5196868580
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. P. Jayatilaka Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Jayatilaka ( CPSO# 95157 )

Business Address:
785 Wonderland Road South
Suite 200
London ON  L6K 1M6

Business Address:
641 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6C 2T9
Phone Number: (519) 686-8585

Business Address:
1345 Huron Street
London ON  N5V 2E3
Phone Number: (519) 659-2331


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Sri Lanka

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:05 Feb 2019 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PADMALI UDAYANI JAYATILAKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAYATILAKA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 31 May 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 05 Nov 2018 to 01 Feb 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 May 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Feb 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2019