skip to content

Jaward, Mohamed Asenkudhoos Abdul

CPSO#: 26906

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Dec 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 23 Dec 2016
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sheffield, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jaward Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 05 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Dec 2016

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: December 23, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Mohamed Asenkudhoos Abdul Jaward to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 23, 2016:

Dr. Jaward was the subject of College investigations into his diagnostic radiology practice. During the investigations, Dr. Jaward resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. As a result, the investigations were terminated.
Download Full Document (PDF)