skip to content

Jawaid, Mehvish

CPSO#: 96875

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Aug 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 22 Aug 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Malton Medical Group
Unit 201
6870 Goreway Drive
Mississauga ON  L4V 1P1
Phone: (905) 677-4200 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Mehvish Jawaid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jawaid ( CPSO# 96875 )

Business Address:
Malton Medical Group
201 - 6870 Goreway Drive
Mississauga ON  L4V 1P1
Phone Number: (905) 677-4200


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:10 May 2013 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Oct 2011 to 31 Oct 2011
EL - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 May 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 23 May 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 22 May 2014 Active
 Dr.   Mehvish  Jawaid  may  practise  medicine  independently  in  Family
                  Medicine, only.