skip to content

Jaswal, Gurpreet

CPSO#: 97725

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Hospital
General Internal Medicine
1245 Lakeshore Road
1N 600 North Tower
Burlington ON  L7S0A2
Phone: (905) 632-3737 Ext. 4110 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
Phone: 905 848-7100 Ext. 0
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Ave West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
Phone: 905-813-2200
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Gurpreet Jaswal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Jaswal ( CPSO# 97725 )

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Hospital
General Internal Medicine
1N 600 North Tower
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Business Address:
2200 Eglington Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective:24 Sep 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GURPREET JASWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JASWAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 13 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 14 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Jan 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017