skip to content

Rayat, Jaspreet Singh

CPSO#: 105618

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jul 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
31 Kingsbury Dr
Kitchener ON  N2A 2L9
Phone: (519) 208-8104
Fax: 519-208-8101 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jaspreet S. Rayat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 20 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rayat ( CPSO# 105618)

Business Address:
31 Kingsbury Drive
Kitchener ON  N2A 2L9

Business Address:
911 Queen`s Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JASPREET SINGH RAYAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAYAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 06 Apr 2015 to 19 Apr 2015
EL - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Apr 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2018