skip to content

Yuen, Jasper See Yin

CPSO#: 81672

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Apr 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Apr 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Radiation Oncology
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 4803
Fax: (905) 813-3962 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jasper Yuen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Yuen ( CPSO# 80948 )
Dr. J. Yuen ( CPSO# 81672 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Radiation Oncology
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100


Corporation Name: Darana Yuen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Yuen ( CPSO# 80948 )
Dr. J. Yuen ( CPSO# 81672 )

Business Address:
EyeMD Institute
401 - 7900 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L6Y 0P6
Phone Number: (905) 456-9500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective:30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JASPER SEE YIN YUEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YUEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2009