skip to content

Morin, Jason Matthew

CPSO#: 71493

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Feb 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 2022

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jason Matthew Morin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Morin ( CPSO# 71493 )

Business Address:
Niagara Health Services
4421 Queen Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 2L2
Phone Number: (905) 356-2236

Business Address:
Niagara Health Services
4421 Queen Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 2L2
Phone Number: (905) 356-2236

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System - Niagara Site Niagara Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JASON MATTHEW MORIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1999
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2022
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2022
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 28 Jan 2022
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 28 Feb 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2022

Previous Hearings

Committee: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Decision Date: 27 Jan 2022
Summary:

On April 21, 2021, the College referred allegations of professional misconduct against Dr. Morin to the Discipline Committee, now the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal.

The OPSDT heard the matter on January 27, 2022 by videoconference. Counsel for both the College and Dr. Morin attended the hearing, as did Dr. Morin.

On the basis of an Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission on Liability and after hearing submissions from both parties, the OPSDT found Dr. Morin committed an act of professional misconduct in that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.

Penalty and costs

On January 27, 2022, the OPSDT issued its Order directing that:
• Dr. Morin attend before the panel to be reprimanded
• The Registrar suspend Dr. Morin’s certificate of registration for period of one month commencing January 28, 2022 at 12:01 a.m.
• The Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Morin’s certificate of registration effective immediately:
a. Dr. Morin shall comply with the College Policy “Closing a Medical Practice”
b. Dr. Morin shall participate in and successfully complete, at his own expense, within six (6) months of the date of this Order, the Safer Opioid Prescribing course offered by the University of Toronto, and will provide proof to the College of his successful completion, including proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports
c. Dr. Morin shall participate in and successfully complete, at his own expense, within six months of the date of this Order, individualized instruction in medical ethics and professionalism (including education in the management of domestic violence), satisfactory to the College with an instructor approved by the College, who shall provide a summative report to the College including whether Dr. Morin has successfully completed the instruction
• Dr. Morin pay costs of $6,000 to the College by February 28, 2022.

More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below. 


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): 2022-01-27