skip to content

Jarrell, John Frederick

CPSO#: 27649

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jul 1996
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 17 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jan 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Apr 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jul 1996