Jaques, Alayna (CPSO#: 98724)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Charles Univ Prague, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3B101 - 713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON  K2K 1T0
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Ext. 3917
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alayna Jaques Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jaques ( CPSO# 98724 )

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
Suite 3B101
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 28 Jul 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALAYNA JAQUES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAQUES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 02 Jul 2012 to 28 Sep 2012
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2012 to 02 Jan 2013
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Geriatric Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Geriatric Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2014